Pearson v. Samsonite Company Stores, Inc. (3:09-cv-01263)

District Court, N.D. California

Date Filed
Description

1

Mar 24, 2009

COMPLAINT (with jury demand) against Samsonite Company Stores, Inc., Samsonite Corporation (Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 34611030264). Filed by Rosalie Pearson, Dennis Newsham. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2009) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/25/2009: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (cjl, COURT STAFF). Modified on 3/25/2009 (cjl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/25/2009)

Main Doc

Att 1

Civil Cover Sheet

2

Mar 24, 2009

Summons Issued as to Samsonite Company Stores, Inc., Samsonite Corporation. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2009) (cjl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/25/2009)

Main Doc

3

Mar 24, 2009

ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 6/29/2009. Case Management Conference set for 7/6/2009 04:00 PM. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2009) (Entered: 03/25/2009)

Main Doc

Att 1

Standing Order

Mar 24, 2009

CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2009)

4

Mar 25, 2009

Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Rosalie Pearson, Dennis Newsham. (Schwartz, Bryan) (Filed on 3/25/2009) (Entered: 03/25/2009)

Main Doc

5

Mar 25, 2009

CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge. (hlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2009) Modified on 3/26/2009 (cjl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/25/2009)

Main Doc

6

Mar 26, 2009

ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Hon. Jeffrey S. White for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Wayne D. Brazil no longer assigned to the case. Signed by the Executive Committee on March 26, 2009. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2009) (Entered: 03/26/2009)

Main Doc

7

Mar 26, 2009

SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rosalie Pearson, Dennis Newsham. Samsonite Company Stores, Inc. served on 3/25/2009, answer due 4/14/2009; Samsonite Corporation served on 3/25/2009, answer due 4/14/2009. (Schwartz, Bryan) (Filed on 3/26/2009) (Entered: 03/26/2009)

Main Doc

8

Apr 7, 2009

INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 7/10/2009 01:30 PM. Case Management Statement due by 7/2/2009.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/7/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2009) (Entered: 04/07/2009)

Main Doc

9

Apr 14, 2009

STIPULATION REGARDING EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT by Samsonite Company Stores, Inc., Samsonite Corporation. (Lee, Daniel) (Filed on 4/14/2009) (Entered: 04/14/2009)

Main Doc

10

Apr 27, 2009

NOTICE by Rosalie Pearson, Dennis Newsham of Consent Filing (Attachments: # 1 FLSA Consent)(Schwartz, Bryan) (Filed on 4/27/2009) (Entered: 04/27/2009)

Main Doc

Att 1

FLSA Consent

11

Apr 27, 2009

ERRATA re 10 Notice (Other) Corrected Certificate of Service for Docket #10 by Rosalie Pearson, Dennis Newsham. (Schwartz, Bryan) (Filed on 4/27/2009) (Entered: 04/27/2009)

Main Doc

12

May 6, 2009

NOTICE by Rosalie Pearson, Dennis Newsham Notice of Consent Filing (Attachments: # 1 Consent Form)(Schwartz, Bryan) (Filed on 5/6/2009) (Entered: 05/06/2009)

Main Doc

Att 1

Consent Form

13

May 27, 2009

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Rosalie Pearson, Dennis Newsham re 8 Initial Scheduling Scheduling Order In Accordance With Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and 5 and Civ. L.R. 5-6(a) (Schwartz, Bryan) (Filed on 5/27/2009) (Entered: 05/27/2009)

Main Doc

14

May 29, 2009

AMENDED COMPLAINT against Samsonite Company Stores, Inc., Samsonite Corporation. Filed byRosalie Pearson, Dennis Newsham. (Schwartz, Bryan) (Filed on 5/29/2009) (Entered: 05/29/2009)

Main Doc

15

Jun 5, 2009

NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) filed by Defendants Samsonite Company Stores and Samsonite Corporation (Lee, Daniel) (Filed on 6/5/2009) (Entered: 06/05/2009)

Main Doc

16

Jun 5, 2009

ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options filed by Defendants Samsonite Company Sotres and Samsonite Corporation (Lee, Daniel) (Filed on 6/5/2009) (Entered: 06/05/2009)

Main Doc

17

Jun 5, 2009

NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) filed by Defendants Samsonite Company Stores and Samsonite Corporation (Lee, Daniel) (Filed on 6/5/2009) (Entered: 06/05/2009)

Main Doc

18

Jun 8, 2009

ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Schwartz, Bryan) (Filed on 6/8/2009) (Entered: 06/08/2009)

Main Doc

19

Jun 8, 2009

STIPULATION re 14 Amended Complaint STIPULATION REGARDING EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Samsonite Company Stores, Inc., Samsonite Corporation. (Lee, Daniel) (Filed on 6/8/2009) (Entered: 06/08/2009)

Main Doc

20

Jun 10, 2009

Certificate of Interested Entities by Samsonite Company Stores, Inc., Samsonite Corporation (Lee, Daniel) (Filed on 6/10/2009) (Entered: 06/10/2009)

Main Doc

21

Jun 18, 2009

Defendants' ANSWER to Amended Complaint bySamsonite Company Stores, Inc., Samsonite Corporation. (Lee, Daniel) (Filed on 6/18/2009) (Entered: 06/18/2009)

Main Doc

22

Jun 19, 2009

Certificate of Interested Entities by Dennis Newsham, Rosalie Pearson (Schwartz, Bryan) (Filed on 6/19/2009) (Entered: 06/19/2009)

Main Doc

23

Jun 30, 2009

ADR Clerks Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on 7/6/09 at 1:30 p.m. Please take note that plaintiff's counsel initiates the call to all parties. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2009) (Entered: 06/30/2009)

Main Doc

24

Jul 2, 2009

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT, FRCP 26(F) REPORT filed by Samsonite Company Stores, Inc., Samsonite Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Lee, Daniel) (Filed on 7/2/2009) (Entered: 07/02/2009)

Main Doc

Att 1

Proposed Order

Jul 7, 2009

ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held by DB on 7/6/09. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2009)

25

Jul 13, 2009

Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 7/10/2009 before Judge Jeffrey S. White (Date Filed: 7/13/2009). (Court Reporter Jim Yeomans.) (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/13/2009) (Entered: 07/13/2009)

Main Doc

26

Jul 15, 2009

Statement JOINT STATEMENT OF PLAINTIFFS AND DEFENDANTS RE: MAGISTRATE JUDGES by Samsonite Company Stores, Inc., Samsonite Corporation. (Lee, Daniel) (Filed on 7/15/2009) (Entered: 07/15/2009)

Main Doc

Jul 31, 2009

CASE REFERRED to ADR for Mediation 25 . (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2009)

27

Aug 20, 2009

ADR Clerks Notice Appointing Baldwin Lee as Mediator. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2009) (Entered: 08/20/2009)

Main Doc

28

Sep 1, 2009

STIPULATION Requesting Order Changing Time in Light of Pending Mediation Efforts, Under Local Civil Rule 6-2 by Dennis Newsham, Rosalie Pearson. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Schwartz, Bryan) (Filed on 9/1/2009) (Entered: 09/01/2009)

Main Doc

Att 1

Proposed Order

29

Sep 1, 2009

Declaration of Bryan J. Schwartz in Support of 28 Stipulation Requesting Order Changing Time in Light of Pending Mediation Efforts, Under Local Civil Rule 6-2 filed byDennis Newsham, Rosalie Pearson. (Related document(s) 28 ) (Schwartz, Bryan) (Filed on 9/1/2009) (Entered: 09/01/2009)

Main Doc

30

Sep 1, 2009

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Dennis Newsham, Rosalie Pearson of Civil Standing Orders for Hon. Jeffrey S. White, U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California (Schwartz, Bryan) (Filed on 9/1/2009) (Entered: 09/01/2009)

Main Doc

31

Sep 1, 2009

ORDER GRANTING 28 Stipulation to Change Time. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on September 1, 2009. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2009) (Entered: 09/01/2009)

Sep 1, 2009

Set/Reset Deadlines as to Motion Hearing set for 1/15/2010 09:00 AM. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2009)

32

Sep 3, 2009

NOTICE by Samsonite Company Stores, Inc., Samsonite Corporation Of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy (Deniston, Martin) (Filed on 9/3/2009) (Entered: 09/03/2009)

Main Doc

33

Sep 10, 2009

STIPULATION to Toll Statute of Limitations for FLSA Putative Class Members by Dennis Newsham, Rosalie Pearson. (Schwartz, Bryan) (Filed on 9/10/2009) (Entered: 09/10/2009)

Main Doc

34

Sep 10, 2009

Reply Memorandum RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT SAMSONITE COMPANY STORES, INC.S NOTICE OF CHAPTER 11 BANKRUPTCY filed byDennis Newsham, Rosalie Pearson. (Schwartz, Bryan) (Filed on 9/10/2009) (Entered: 09/10/2009)

Main Doc

35

Sep 11, 2009

ORDER GRANTING 33 Stipulation to Toll Statute of Limitations for FLSA Putative Class Members. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/11/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2009) (Entered: 09/11/2009)

Sep 15, 2009

Set/Reset Hearings: Mediation Hearing set for 10/14/2009 9:00 a.m., at the Mediator's offices Allen Matkins Three Embarcadero Center, 12th Floor, San Francisco, CA 94111. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2009) Modified on 9/21/2009 (af, COURT STAFF).

36

Sep 18, 2009

NOTICE by Dennis Newsham, Rosalie Pearson Notice of Consent Filing Under FLSA, 29 U.S.C. Sec. 216 (Schwartz, Bryan) (Filed on 9/18/2009) (Entered: 09/18/2009)

Main Doc

37

Sep 21, 2009

NOTICE by Dennis Newsham, Rosalie Pearson Notice of Consent Filing Under FLSA, 29 U.S.C. Sec. 216 (Schwartz, Bryan) (Filed on 9/21/2009) (Entered: 09/21/2009)

Main Doc

38

Oct 7, 2009

ORDER APPROVING TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE AT MEDIATION (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2009) (Entered: 10/07/2009)

39

Oct 19, 2009

NOTICE by Dennis Newsham, Rosalie Pearson of Consent Filing under FLSA (Schwartz, Bryan) (Filed on 10/19/2009) (Entered: 10/19/2009)

Main Doc

40

Oct 22, 2009

CERTIFICATION OF MEDIATION Session 10/14/09, case not settled, another session scheduled for 11/2/09, mediation continuing. Signed by Mediator, Baldwin Lee, dated 10/19/09. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2009) (Entered: 10/22/2009)

Main Doc

41

Nov 10, 2009

NOTICE by Dennis Newsham, Rosalie Pearson re 36 Notice (Other) Withdrawal of Opt-In Plaintiff From Lawsuit (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Schwartz, Bryan) (Filed on 11/10/2009) (Entered: 11/10/2009)

Main Doc

Att 1

Exhibit

42

Nov 17, 2009

NOTICE by Dennis Newsham, Rosalie Pearson of Consent Filing under 29 U.S.C. sec. 216(b) (Schwartz, Bryan) (Filed on 11/17/2009) (Entered: 11/17/2009)

Main Doc

43

Nov 20, 2009

Joint MOTION for Settlement FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF JOINT STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT AND RELEASE BETWEEN PLAINTIFFS AND DEFENDANTS filed by Dennis Newsham, Rosalie Pearson. Motion Hearing set for 12/18/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Joint Stipulation of Settlement and Release Between Plaintiffs and Defendants, plus Exhibits to same (including proposed Order))(Schwartz, Bryan) (Filed on 11/20/2009) (Entered: 11/20/2009)

Main Doc

Att 1

Exhibit Joint Stipulation of Settlement and Release Between Plaintiffs and Defen

44

Nov 20, 2009

Declaration of Bryan J. Schwartz, Esq. in Support of 43 Joint MOTION for Settlement FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF JOINT STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT AND RELEASE BETWEEN PLAINTIFFS AND DEFENDANTS filed byDennis Newsham, Rosalie Pearson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12)(Related document(s) 43 ) (Schwartz, Bryan) (Filed on 11/20/2009) (Entered: 11/20/2009)

Main Doc

Att 1

Exhibit 1

Att 2

Exhibit 2

Att 3

Exhibit 3

Att 4

Exhibit 4

Att 5

Exhibit 5

Att 6

Exhibit 6

Att 7

Exhibit 7

Att 8

Exhibit 8

Att 9

Exhibit 9

Att 10

Exhibit 10

Att 11

Exhibit 11

Att 12

Exhibit 12

45

Nov 20, 2009

Joint MOTION for an Enlarged Page Limit for MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF JOINT STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT AND RELEASE BETWEEN PLAINTIFFS AND DEFENDANTS re 43 Joint MOTION for Settlement FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF JOINT STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT AND RELEASE BETWEEN PLAINTIFFS AND DEFENDANTS filed by Dennis Newsham, Rosalie Pearson. Motion Hearing set for 12/18/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Schwartz, Bryan) (Filed on 11/20/2009) (Entered: 11/20/2009)

Main Doc

Att 1

Proposed Order

46

Nov 20, 2009

Joint MOTION to Seal Document FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF UNDER CIV. L.R. 7-11, TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO CIV. L.R. 79-5(c), regarding portions of Exhibit D to Joint Stipulation of Settlement (Dkt. #43-1) filed by Dennis Newsham, Rosalie Pearson. Motion Hearing set for 12/18/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Schwartz, Bryan) (Filed on 11/20/2009) (Entered: 11/20/2009)

Main Doc

Att 1

Proposed Order

47

Nov 20, 2009

Declaration of Bryan J. Schwartz, Esq. in Support of 46 Joint MOTION to Seal Document FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF UNDER CIV. L.R. 7-11, TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO CIV. L.R. 79-5(c), regarding portions of Exhibit D to Joint Stipulation of Settlement (Dkt. #43-1)Joint MOTION to Seal Document FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF UNDER CIV. L.R. 7-11, TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO CIV. L.R. 79-5(c), regarding portions of Exhibit D to Joint Stipulation of Settlement (Dkt. #43-1) filed byDennis Newsham, Rosalie Pearson. (Related document(s) 46 ) (Schwartz, Bryan) (Filed on 11/20/2009) (Entered: 11/20/2009)

Main Doc

48

Nov 20, 2009

Statement re 47 Declaration in Support,, 44 Declaration in Support,, 45 Joint MOTION for an Enlarged Page Limit for MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF JOINT STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT AND RELEASE BETWEEN PLAINTIFFS AND DEFENDANTS re 43 Joint MOTION for Settlement FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF JOINT STIPULATION OF SETTLEMEJoint MOTION for an Enlarged Page Limit for MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF JOINT STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT AND RELEASE BETWEEN PLAINTIFFS AND DEFENDANTS re 43 Joint MOTION for Settlement FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF JOINT STIPULATION OF SETTLEMEJoint MOTION for an Enlarged Page Limit for MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF JOINT STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT AND RELEASE BETWEEN PLAINTIFFS AND DEFENDANTS re 43 Joint MOTION for Settlement FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF JOINT STIPULATION OF SETTLEME, 46 Joint MOTION to Seal Document FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF UNDER CIV. L.R. 7-11, TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO CIV. L.R. 79-5(c), regarding portions of Exhibit D to Joint Stipulation of Settlement (Dkt. #43-1)Joint MOTION to Seal Document FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF UNDER CIV. L.R. 7-11, TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO CIV. L.R. 79-5(c), regarding portions of Exhibit D to Joint Stipulation of Settlement (Dkt. #43-1), 43 Joint MOTION for Settlement FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF JOINT STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT AND RELEASE BETWEEN PLAINTIFFS AND DEFENDANTS Certificate of Service regarding Dkt. #'s 43-47 by Dennis Newsham, Rosalie Pearson. (Schwartz, Bryan) (Filed on 11/20/2009) (Entered: 11/20/2009)

Main Doc

49

Nov 20, 2009

Joint MOTION for Settlement Approval Hearing Date filed by Samsonite Company Stores, Inc., Samsonite Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 12/18/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Deniston, Martin) (Filed on 11/20/2009) (Entered: 11/20/2009)

Main Doc

50

Nov 20, 2009

Declaration of Daniel H. Lee in Support of 43 Joint MOTION for Settlement FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF JOINT STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT AND RELEASE BETWEEN PLAINTIFFS AND DEFENDANTS filed bySamsonite Company Stores, Inc., Samsonite Corporation. (Related document(s) 43 ) (Deniston, Martin) (Filed on 11/20/2009) (Entered: 11/20/2009)

Main Doc

Nov 20, 2009

Received Document (UNDER SEAL) Exhibt D by Samsonite Company Stores, Inc., Samsonite Corporation. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2009)

54

Nov 20, 2009

(UNDER SEAL) EXHIBIT D in Support of Joint Stipulation filed byDennis Newsham, Rosalie Pearson, Samsonite Company Stores, Inc., Samsonite Corporation. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2009) (Entered: 12/02/2009)

Main Doc

51

Nov 30, 2009

ORDER GRANTING 49 MOTION for Settlement Approval Hearing Date. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 11/30/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2009) (Entered: 11/30/2009)

52

Nov 30, 2009

ORDER GRANTING 45 Joint MOTION for an Enlarged Page Limit. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 11/30/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2009) (Entered: 11/30/2009)

53

Nov 30, 2009

ORDER GRANTING 46 FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF UNDER CIV. L.R. 7-11, TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO CIV. L.R. 79-5(c). Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 11/30/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2009) (Entered: 11/30/2009)

55

Dec 10, 2009

CERTIFICATION OF MEDIATION Session 11/2/09, case fully settled, mediation complete. Signed by Mediator, Baldwin Lee, dated 11/10/09. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2009) (Entered: 12/10/2009)

Main Doc

56

Dec 17, 2009

NOTICE OF TENTATIVE RULING AND QUESTIONS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on December 17, 2009. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2009) (Entered: 12/17/2009)

57

Dec 17, 2009

NOTICE by Samsonite Company Stores, Inc., Samsonite Corporation NOTICE AND STIPULATOIN REGARDING COURT'S TENTATIVE RULING AND QUESTIONS (Lee, Daniel) (Filed on 12/17/2009) (Entered: 12/17/2009)

Main Doc

58

Dec 17, 2009

EXHIBITS re 56 Order, 57 Notice (Other), 43 Joint MOTION for Settlement FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF JOINT STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT AND RELEASE BETWEEN PLAINTIFFS AND DEFENDANTS Revised Exhibit F (Proposed Class Notice) Pursuant to Stipulation (Dkt. #57) and to Address Court Questions (Dkt. #56) filed byDennis Newsham, Rosalie Pearson. (Related document(s) 56, 57, 43 ) (Schwartz, Bryan) (Filed on 12/17/2009) (Entered: 12/17/2009)

Main Doc

59

Dec 17, 2009

Declaration of Dennis Newsham in Support of 43 Joint MOTION for Settlement FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF JOINT STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT AND RELEASE BETWEEN PLAINTIFFS AND DEFENDANTS Regarding Representative Plaintiff Enhancements filed byDennis Newsham, Rosalie Pearson. (Related document(s) 43 ) (Schwartz, Bryan) (Filed on 12/17/2009) (Entered: 12/17/2009)

Main Doc

60

Dec 17, 2009

Declaration of Rosalie Pearson in Support of 43 Joint MOTION for Settlement FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF JOINT STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT AND RELEASE BETWEEN PLAINTIFFS AND DEFENDANTS Regarding Representative Plaintiff Enhancements filed byDennis Newsham, Rosalie Pearson. (Related document(s) 43 ) (Schwartz, Bryan) (Filed on 12/17/2009) (Entered: 12/17/2009)

Main Doc

61

Dec 18, 2009

Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 12/18/2009 before Judge Jeffrey S. White (Date Filed: 12/18/2009). (Court Reporter Joan Columbini.) (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/18/2009) (Entered: 12/18/2009)

Main Doc

62

Dec 18, 2009

ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White GRANTING 43 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement and GRANTING Collective and Class Action Notification. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2009) (Entered: 12/18/2009)

Main Doc

63

Dec 18, 2009

ORDER Approving Notice of Settlement of Class and Collective Action. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on December 18, 2009. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2009) (Entered: 12/18/2009)

64

Feb 9, 2010

STIPULATION OF THE PARTIES REQUESTING TO HAVE THEIR JOINT MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT HEARD ON APRIL 9, 2010 by Dennis Newsham, Rosalie Pearson. (Schwartz, Bryan) (Filed on 2/9/2010) (Entered: 02/09/2010)

Main Doc

65

Feb 9, 2010

Declaration of Bryan J. Schwartz, Esq. in Support of 64 Stipulation OF THE PARTIES REQUESTING TO HAVE THEIR JOINT MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT HEARD ON APRIL 9, 2010 filed byDennis Newsham, Rosalie Pearson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 64 ) (Schwartz, Bryan) (Filed on 2/9/2010) (Entered: 02/09/2010)

Main Doc

Att 1

Exhibit A

66

Feb 17, 2010

ORDER granting 64 Stipulation OF THE PARTIES REQUESTING TO HAVE THEIR JOINT MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT HEARD ON APRIL 9, 2010. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 2/17/10. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2010) (Entered: 02/17/2010)

Feb 17, 2010

Set/Reset Deadlines as to Motion Hearing set for 4/9/2010 09:00 AM. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2010)

67

Apr 1, 2010

NOTICE of Appearance by Hillary Jo Baker (Baker, Hillary) (Filed on 4/1/2010) (Entered: 04/01/2010)

Main Doc

68

Apr 2, 2010

EXHIBITS RE: 43 Joint Motion for Settlement filed byDennis Newsham, Rosalie Pearson, Samsonite Company Stores, Inc., Samsonite Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B (Revised 4/1/2010), # 2 Exhibit C)(Baker, Hillary) (Filed on 4/2/2010) (Entered: 04/02/2010)

Main Doc

Att 1

Exhibit B (Revised 4/1/2010)

Att 2

Exhibit C

69

Apr 2, 2010

Declaration of DANIEL H. LEE in Support of 68 Exhibits, DECLARATION OF DANIEL H. LEE IN SUPPORT OF JOINT MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT filed bySamsonite Company Stores, Inc., Samsonite Corporation. (Related document(s) 68 ) (Lee, Daniel) (Filed on 4/2/2010) (Entered: 04/02/2010)

Main Doc

70

Apr 2, 2010

Joint MOTION for Settlement for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Representative Plaintiffs' Enhancements and Plaintiffs' Attorneys' Fees and Costs filed by Dennis Newsham, Rosalie Pearson, Samsonite Company Stores, Inc., Samsonite Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 4/9/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Schwartz, Bryan) (Filed on 4/2/2010) (Entered: 04/02/2010)

Main Doc

71

Apr 2, 2010

Proposed Order re 70 Joint MOTION for Settlement for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Representative Plaintiffs' Enhancements and Plaintiffs' Attorneys' Fees and Costs by Dennis Newsham, Rosalie Pearson, Samsonite Company Stores, Inc., Samsonite Corporation. (Schwartz, Bryan) (Filed on 4/2/2010) (Entered: 04/02/2010)

Main Doc

72

Apr 2, 2010

Declaration of Bryan J. Schwartz, Esq. in Support of 70 Joint MOTION for Settlement for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Representative Plaintiffs' Enhancements and Plaintiffs' Attorneys' Fees and Costs filed byDennis Newsham, Rosalie Pearson. (Related document(s) 70 ) (Schwartz, Bryan) (Filed on 4/2/2010) (Entered: 04/02/2010)

Main Doc

73

Apr 2, 2010

Declaration of Jonathan Paul in Support of 70 Joint MOTION for Settlement for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Representative Plaintiffs' Enhancements and Plaintiffs' Attorneys' Fees and Costs, including Exhibits A and B to Declaration filed byDennis Newsham, Rosalie Pearson, Samsonite Company Stores, Inc., Samsonite Corporation. (Related document(s) 70 ) (Schwartz, Bryan) (Filed on 4/2/2010) (Entered: 04/02/2010)

Main Doc

74

Apr 2, 2010

Declaration of David Borgen in Support of 70 Joint MOTION for Settlement for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Representative Plaintiffs' Enhancements and Plaintiffs' Attorneys' Fees and Costs, including Exhibits A and B to Declaration filed byDennis Newsham, Rosalie Pearson. (Related document(s) 70 ) (Schwartz, Bryan) (Filed on 4/2/2010) (Entered: 04/02/2010)

Main Doc

75

Apr 2, 2010

Declaration of Hillary Jo Baker, Esq. in Support of 70 Joint MOTION for Settlement for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Representative Plaintiffs' Enhancements and Plaintiffs' Attorneys' Fees and Costs filed byDennis Newsham, Rosalie Pearson. (Related document(s) 70 ) (Baker, Hillary) (Filed on 4/2/2010) (Entered: 04/02/2010)

Main Doc

76

Apr 2, 2010

MOTION to Seal Document 75 Declaration in Support, filed by Dennis Newsham, Rosalie Pearson, Samsonite Company Stores, Inc., Samsonite Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 4/9/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Bryan J. Schwartz, Esq. In Support of Motion to File Under Seal, # 2 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal)(Baker, Hillary) (Filed on 4/2/2010) (Entered: 04/02/2010)

Main Doc

Att 1

Affidavit Declaration of Bryan J. Schwartz, Esq. In Support of Motion to File Un

Att 2

Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal

77

Apr 2, 2010

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Dennis Newsham, Rosalie Pearson re 76 MOTION to Seal Document 75 Declaration in Support, MOTION to Seal Document 75 Declaration in Support,, 75 Declaration in Support, (Baker, Hillary) (Filed on 4/2/2010) (Entered: 04/02/2010)

Main Doc

79

Apr 5, 2010

(UNDER SEAL) EXHIBIT 1 70 Joint MOTION for Settlement for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Representative Plaintiffs' Enhancements and Plaintiffs' Attorneys' Fees and Costs filed byDennis Newsham, Rosalie Pearson. (Related document(s) 70 ) (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2010) (Entered: 04/06/2010)

Main Doc

78

Apr 6, 2010

ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting 76 Motion to Seal Document (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2010) (Entered: 04/06/2010)

Main Doc

80

Apr 9, 2010

Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 4/9/2010 before Judge Jeffrey S. White. The Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement is taken under submission. (Court Reporter: Jim Yeomans) (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/9/2010) (Entered: 04/09/2010)

Main Doc

81

Apr 9, 2010

ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White GRANTING 70 Motion for Settlement and Final Judgment. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2010) (Entered: 04/09/2010)

Main Doc

82

Apr 27, 2010

NOTICE by Dennis Newsham, Rosalie Pearson of Settlement Distribution (Schwartz, Bryan) (Filed on 4/27/2010) (Entered: 04/27/2010)

Main Doc

83

Aug 23, 2010

NOTICE by Dennis Newsham, Rosalie Pearson of Second Settlement Distribution (Schwartz, Bryan) (Filed on 8/23/2010) (Entered: 08/23/2010)

Main Doc

Newsletter

Sign up to receive the Free Law Project newsletter with tips and announcements.