Charles v. The City Of New York. (1:12-cv-06180)

District Court, E.D. New York

Date Filed
Description

1

Dec 17, 2012

COMPLAINT against Joe Doe, Raymond Kelly, The City Of New York., Raymond Williams Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -no,, filed by Hadiyah Charles. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Sica, Michele) (Entered: 12/18/2012)

Main Doc

Att 1

Civil Cover Sheet

2

Dec 17, 2012

Summons Issued as to Pamela Benities, Raymond Kelly, The City Of New York., Raymond Williams. (Sica, Michele) (Entered: 12/18/2012)

Main Doc

Dec 17, 2012

FILING FEE: $ 350, receipt number 4653052660 (Sica, Michele)

3

Dec 18, 2012

In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Sica, Michele) (Entered: 12/18/2012)

Main Doc

4

Dec 27, 2012

MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or otherwise respond to complaint by Raymond Kelly, The City Of New York.. (Zuckerman, Mark) (Entered: 12/27/2012)

Main Doc

Dec 27, 2012

SCHEDULING ORDER for telephone conference re 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or otherwise respond to complaint filed by Raymond Kelly, The City Of New York. A telephone conference will be held on JANUARY 7, 2013 at 02:00 PM before Chief Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold. Defendants' counsel is directed to arrange the call with all parties. So Ordered by Chief Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 12/27/2012. (Megdal, Deborah)

5

Jan 3, 2013

RESPONSE to Motion re 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or otherwise respond to complaint filed by Hadiyah Charles. (Karteron, Alexis) (Entered: 01/03/2013)

Main Doc

Jan 3, 2013

ORDER re 5 Response to Motion filed by Hadiyah Charles, 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or otherwise respond to complaint filed by Raymond Kelly, The City Of New York. Counsels' applications will be discussed at the conference already scheduled for January 7th. So Ordered by Chief Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 1/3/2013. (Vasquez, Lea)

6

Jan 7, 2013

SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hadiyah Charles. The City Of New York. served on 12/19/2012, answer due 1/9/2013. (Karteron, Alexis) (Entered: 01/07/2013)

Main Doc

7

Jan 7, 2013

SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hadiyah Charles. Raymond Kelly served on 12/19/2012, answer due 1/9/2013. (Karteron, Alexis) (Entered: 01/07/2013)

Main Doc

8

Jan 7, 2013

SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hadiyah Charles. Pamela Benities served on 12/21/2012, answer due 1/11/2013. (Karteron, Alexis) (Entered: 01/07/2013)

Main Doc

9

Jan 7, 2013

SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hadiyah Charles. Raymond Williams served on 12/21/2012, answer due 1/11/2013. (Karteron, Alexis) (Entered: 01/07/2013)

Main Doc

10

Jan 8, 2013

Minute Entry for Telephone Conference held on 1/7/2013 before Chief Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold: Karteron and Dunn for plaintiff, Zuckerman for defendants. Defendants' application to extend their time to answer to March 8, 2013 is granted. THE COURT WILL HOLD AN INITIAL CONFERENCE AT 2:00 P.M. ON MARCH 12, 2013. (Vasquez, Lea) Modified on 1/8/2013 (Vasquez, Lea). (Entered: 01/08/2013)

Main Doc

11

Mar 4, 2013

ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Pamela Benities, Raymond Kelly, The City Of New York., Raymond Williams. (Zuckerman, Mark) (Entered: 03/04/2013)

Main Doc

12

Mar 4, 2013

MOTION for pre motion conference by Pamela Benities, Raymond Kelly, The City Of New York., Raymond Williams. (Zuckerman, Mark) (Entered: 03/04/2013)

Main Doc

13

Mar 8, 2013

MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 12 MOTION for pre motion conference filed by Hadiyah Charles. (Dunn, Christopher) (Entered: 03/08/2013)

14

Mar 13, 2013

Minute Entry for Initial Conference Hearing held on 3/12/2013 before Chief Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold: Karteron, with students, for plaintiff; Zuckerman for defendants. The parties will complete fact discovery concerning te particular incident at issue by June 15. THE COURT WILL HOLD A CONFERENCE AT 2:00 PM ON JUNE 21. Principals with full settlement decision-making authority must be present or available by telephone. Counsel shall be prepared to schedule any remaining discovery (i.w., Monell discovery) and any anticipated motion practice. (Vasquez, Lea) (Entered: 03/13/2013)

Main Doc

15

Apr 11, 2013

MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Hadiyah Charles. (Karteron, Alexis) (Entered: 04/11/2013)

Apr 11, 2013

ORDER granting 15 Motion for Leave to File an amended complaint. So Ordered by Chief Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 4/11/2013. (Vasquez, Lea)

16

Apr 15, 2013

AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Hadiyah Charles. (Karteron, Alexis) (Entered: 04/15/2013)

17

Apr 16, 2013

AMENDED Summons Issued as to Anthony Famighetti. (Sica, Michele) (Entered: 04/16/2013)

Main Doc

18

Apr 18, 2013

SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hadiyah Charles. Anthony Famighetti served on 4/16/2013, answer due 5/7/2013. (Karteron, Alexis) (Entered: 04/18/2013)

Main Doc

19

Apr 25, 2013

Letter alerting the Court to a discovery dispute by Hadiyah Charles (Karteron, Alexis) (Entered: 04/25/2013)

Main Doc

Apr 26, 2013

SCHEDULING ORDER re 19 Letter filed by Hadiyah Charles: A telephone conference will be held at 9:45 a.m. on April 30, 2013 before the undersigned. Counsel for plaintiff is directed to arrange the call with all parties as well as immediately confirm this conference date and time with defendants' counsel. Counsel for defendant may submit a response, if any, by April 29th. So Ordered by Chief Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 4/26/2013. (Vasquez, Lea)

20

Apr 26, 2013

Letter in response to letter alerting court to discovery dispute by plaintiff by Pamela Benities, Raymond Kelly, The City Of New York., Raymond Williams (Zuckerman, Mark) (Entered: 04/26/2013)

Main Doc

21

Apr 26, 2013

ANSWER to 16 Amended Complaint with jury demand by Pamela Benities, Anthony Famighetti, Raymond Kelly, The City Of New York., Raymond Williams. (Zuckerman, Mark) (Entered: 04/26/2013)

Main Doc

22

Apr 30, 2013

Minute Entry for Telephone Conference held on 4/30/2013 before Chief Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold: Karteron for plaintiff, Zuckerman for defendants. Defendants will provide the identities and contact information of the three individuals at issue subject to a protective order that includes the terms discussed on the record of today's proceeding. (Tape #FTR 9:46-9:53.) (Vasquez, Lea) (Entered: 04/30/2013)

Main Doc

23

May 1, 2013

Letter submitting proposed stipulation and protective order by Hadiyah Charles (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Karteron, Alexis) (Entered: 05/01/2013)

Main Doc

Att 1

Proposed Order

24

May 3, 2013

PROTECTIVE ORDER 23 approved and entered as an Order of the Court. So Ordered by Chief Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 5/3/2013. (Vasquez, Lea) (Entered: 05/03/2013)

Main Doc

25

May 15, 2013

Letter and proposed order by The City Of New York. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Zuckerman, Mark) (Entered: 05/15/2013)

Main Doc

Att 1

Proposed Order

May 15, 2013

ORDER re 25 Letter filed by The City Of New York: The proposed Order directing defendant City of New York to produce UF 250 forms relating to D.C., J.M. and T.B. prepared on or about June 5, 2012 to the parties for use in this litigation only is approved and hereby entered as an Order of the Court. So Ordered by Chief Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 5/15/2013. (Vasquez, Lea)

26

Jun 5, 2013

MOTION to Adjourn Conference and to extend discovery by Hadiyah Charles. (Karteron, Alexis) (Entered: 06/05/2013)

Main Doc

Jun 6, 2013

ORDER granting 26 Motion to Adjourn Conference: Discovery is extended to July 19th. The conference previously scheduled for June 21st will instead be held at 10:30 a.m. on July 25th. So Ordered by Chief Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 6/6/2013. (Vasquez, Lea)

27

Jul 2, 2013

Second MOTION to Adjourn Conference and extend discovery by Hadiyah Charles. (Karteron, Alexis) (Entered: 07/02/2013)

Main Doc

28

Jul 2, 2013

RESPONSE in Opposition re 27 Second MOTION to Adjourn Conference and extend discovery filed by The City Of New York.. (Zuckerman, Mark) (Entered: 07/02/2013)

Main Doc

29

Jul 2, 2013

REPLY to Response to Motion re 27 Second MOTION to Adjourn Conference and extend discovery filed by Hadiyah Charles. (Karteron, Alexis) (Entered: 07/02/2013)

Main Doc

Jul 3, 2013

ORDER granting 27 Motion to Adjourn Conference: Discovery is extended to August 23, 2013. The conference previously scheduled for July 25th will instead be held at 10:30 a.m. on September 10, 2013. So Ordered by Chief Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 7/3/2013. (Vasquez, Lea)

30

Aug 19, 2013

MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and adjourn court conference of September 10, 2013 by Pamela Benities, Anthony Famighetti, Raymond Kelly, The City Of New York., Raymond Williams. (Zuckerman, Mark) (Entered: 08/19/2013)

Main Doc

Aug 19, 2013

ORDER granting 30 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. The conference previously scheduled for September 10th will instead be held at 11:00 a.m. on October 9, 2013. So Ordered by Chief Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 8/19/2013. (Vasquez, Lea)

31

Sep 30, 2013

Letter MOTION to Adjourn Conference scheduled for October 9, 2013 by Hadiyah Charles. (Karteron, Alexis) (Entered: 09/30/2013)

Main Doc

Oct 1, 2013

ORDER denying 31 Motion to Adjourn Conference: The conference will proceed on October 9th. In the alternative, counsel may submit another application suggesting a date earlier than October 9th on which to hold the conference. So Ordered by Chief Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 10/1/2013. (Vasquez, Lea)

32

Oct 4, 2013

Letter regarding issues to be addressed at October 9 status conference by Hadiyah Charles (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1) (Karteron, Alexis) (Entered: 10/04/2013)

Main Doc

Att 1

Exhibit 1

33

Oct 8, 2013

Letter in response to letter of plainiffs of October 4, 2013 by Pamela Benities, Anthony Famighetti, Raymond Kelly, The City Of New York., Raymond Williams (Zuckerman, Mark) (Entered: 10/08/2013)

Main Doc

34

Oct 9, 2013

Minute Entry for Settlement Conference held on 10/9/2013 before Chief Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold: Karteron for plaintiff, Zuckerman for defendants. Various discovery rulings on the record. Fact discovery is extended to December 30. Defendants will file a premotion conference application in anticipation of moving for summary judgment by February 17, 2014. Counsel are encouraged to submit a letter seeking a settlement conference if they think it might be productive to hold one. (Tape #FTR 11:01-11:32.) (Vasquez, Lea) (Entered: 10/09/2013)

Main Doc

35

Oct 23, 2013

TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on October 9, 2013, before Judge Gold. Court Transcriber: Fiore Reporting and Transcription Service, Inc., Telephone number (203)929-9992. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/13/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/25/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/21/2014. (Rocco, Christine) (Entered: 10/23/2013)

Main Doc

36

Dec 13, 2013

MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and to compel the production of documents by Hadiyah Charles. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6) (Karteron, Alexis) (Entered: 12/13/2013)

Main Doc

Att 1

Exhibit 1

Att 2

Exhibit 2

Att 3

Exhibit 3

Att 4

Exhibit 4

Att 5

Exhibit 5

Att 6

Exhibit 6

Dec 16, 2013

ORDER deferring ruling on 36 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery: A telephone conference will be held at 12:30 p.m. on December 27, 2013 before the undersigned. Counsel for plaintiff is directed to arrange the call with all parties as well as immediately confirm this conference date and time with defendants' counsel. So Ordered by Chief Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 12/16/2013. (Vasquez, Lea)

37

Dec 17, 2013

RESPONSE to Motion re 36 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and to compel the production of documents filed by Pamela Benities, Anthony Famighetti, Raymond Kelly, The City Of New York., Raymond Williams. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Zuckerman, Mark) (Entered: 12/17/2013)

Main Doc

Att 1

Exhibit A

Dec 27, 2013

ORDER granting in part and denying in part 36 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery as indicated in the minute entry for the telephone conference held today. Ordered by Chief Mag. Judge Steven M. Gold on 12/27/2013. (Gold, Steven)

38

Dec 30, 2013

Minute Entry for Telephone Conference held on 12/27/2013 before Chief Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold: Karteron for plaintiff, Zuckerman for defendants. Defendants will review the documents in defendant Benites' force monitoring file and produce all documents related to false arrest allegations by January 6. Defendants will produce the "robbery pattern" documents discussed in docket entries 36 and 37 by January 24. The date for completing fact discovery is extended to January 31. Defendants may move for spoliation sanctions by February 10, with plaintiff's opposition due February 21 and defendants' reply due February 28. Defendants' time to apply for a premotion conference in anticipation of moving for summary judgment is extended to March 17. (Vasquez, Lea) (Entered: 12/30/2013)

Main Doc

39

Jan 7, 2014

MOTION to Unseal Document and to enter stipulation and protective order by Hadiyah Charles. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B) (Karteron, Alexis) (Entered: 01/07/2014)

Main Doc

Att 1

Exhibit A

Att 2

Exhibit B

Jan 8, 2014

ORDER granting 39 Motion to Unseal Document and the Stipulation and Protective Order. So Ordered by Chief Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 1/8/2014. (Vasquez, Lea)

40

Jan 23, 2014

MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery ("Robbery Pattern" documents at Docket 38) by Pamela Benities, Anthony Famighetti, Raymond Kelly, The City Of New York., Raymond Williams. (Zuckerman, Mark) (Entered: 01/23/2014)

Main Doc

Jan 23, 2014

ORDER granting 40 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Ordered by Chief Mag. Judge Steven M. Gold on 1/23/2014. (Gold, Steven)

41

Feb 7, 2014

Letter regarding motion for spoliation sanctions for destruction of video by Pamela Benities, Anthony Famighetti, Raymond Kelly, The City of New York, Raymond Williams (Zuckerman, Mark) (Entered: 02/07/2014)

Main Doc

42

Feb 10, 2014

MOTION for pre motion conference by Pamela Benities, Anthony Famighetti, Raymond Kelly, The City of New York, Raymond Williams. (Zuckerman, Mark) (Entered: 02/10/2014)

Main Doc

43

Feb 18, 2014

RESPONSE in Opposition re 42 MOTION for pre motion conference filed by Hadiyah Charles. (Karteron, Alexis) (Entered: 02/18/2014)

Main Doc

44

Feb 19, 2014

REPLY to Response to Motion re 42 MOTION for pre motion conference filed by Pamela Benities, Anthony Famighetti, Raymond Kelly, The City of New York, Raymond Williams. (Zuckerman, Mark) (Entered: 02/19/2014)

Main Doc

45

Feb 20, 2014

ORDER denying 42 Motion for Pre Motion Conference; See Order on last page. ( Ordered by Judge Sandra L. Townes on 2/12/2014 ) rec. in dkt 2/19 (Guzzi, Roseann) (Entered: 02/20/2014)

Main Doc

46

Feb 25, 2014

ORDER re 43 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Hadiyah Charles; plaintiff's application to advance the March 17, 2014 deadline for requesting a pre-motion conference is denied without prejudice to raising the issue before Magistrate Judge Gold. ( Ordered by Judge Sandra L. Townes on 2/24/2014 ) (Guzzi, Roseann) (Entered: 02/25/2014)

Main Doc

47

Mar 17, 2014

MOTION for pre motion conference for summary judgment by Pamela Benities, Anthony Famighetti, Raymond Kelly, The City of New York, Raymond Williams. (Attachments: # 1 Rule 56.1 Statement, # 2 Exhibit) (Zuckerman, Mark) (Entered: 03/17/2014)

Main Doc

Att 1

Rule 56.1 Statement

Att 2

Exhibit

48

Mar 24, 2014

RESPONSE in Opposition re 47 MOTION for pre motion conference for summary judgment filed by Hadiyah Charles. (Attachments: # 1 Rule 56.1 Statement, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14) (Karteron, Alexis) (Entered: 03/24/2014)

Main Doc

Att 1

Rule 56.1 Statement

Att 2

Exhibit 1

Att 3

Exhibit 2

Att 4

Exhibit 3

Att 5

Exhibit 4

Att 6

Exhibit 5

Att 7

Exhibit 6

Att 8

Exhibit 7

Att 9

Exhibit 8

Att 10

Exhibit 9

Att 11

Exhibit 10

Att 12

Exhibit 11

Att 13

Exhibit 12

Att 14

Exhibit 13

Att 15

Exhibit 14

49

May 28, 2014

Letter to Court re: Supreme Court's decision in Tolan v. Cotton by Hadiyah Charles (Karteron, Alexis) (Entered: 05/28/2014)

Main Doc

50

Jun 18, 2014

NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan S. Wells on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Wells, Jordan) (Entered: 06/18/2014)

Main Doc

51

Jun 18, 2014

Letter MOTION for Discovery re: Plaintiff's Monell Claim by Hadiyah Charles. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) (Karteron, Alexis) (Entered: 06/18/2014)

Main Doc

Att 1

Exhibit

52

Jun 19, 2014

Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File motion for summary judgment and spoliation sanctions by Pamela Benities, Anthony Famighetti, Raymond Kelly, The City of New York, Raymond Williams. (Zuckerman, Mark) (Entered: 06/19/2014)

Main Doc

53

Jun 19, 2014

Letter MOTION to Adjourn Conference scheduled for July 2, 2014 by Hadiyah Charles. (Karteron, Alexis) (Entered: 06/19/2014)

Main Doc

54

Jun 23, 2014

RESPONSE in Opposition re 51 Letter MOTION for Discovery re: Plaintiff's Monell Claim filed by Pamela Benities, Anthony Famighetti, Raymond Kelly, The City of New York, Raymond Williams. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E) (Zuckerman, Mark) (Entered: 06/23/2014)

Main Doc

Att 1

Exhibit A

Att 2

Exhibit B

Att 3

Exhibit C

Att 4

Exhibit D

Att 5

Exhibit E

55

Jun 24, 2014

ORDER dated 6/20/14 granting 52 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Extension granted on Consent. ( Ordered by Judge Sandra L. Townes on 6/20/2014 ) (Guzzi, Roseann) (Entered: 06/24/2014)

Main Doc

56

Jul 8, 2014

Minute Entry for Status Conference held on 7/7/2014 before Chief Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold: Karteron and Wells for plaintiff, Zuckerman for defendants. Plaintiff may propound Monell written discovery demands by July 11. For the time being, these demands will be limited as indicated on the record to general policies and procedures for dealing with onlookers and particularly recording onlookers and training about them. Defendants will respond by August 15. Counsel will submit a letter by September 12 indicating whether they seek a further conference. (Tape #FTR 2:52-3:08.) (Vasquez, Lea) (Entered: 07/08/2014)

Main Doc

57

Jul 8, 2014

Letter regarding proposed briefing schedule on the individual defendants motoin for summary judgment and spoliation sanctions by Pamela Benities, Anthony Famighetti, Raymond Kelly, The City of New York, Raymond Williams (Zuckerman, Mark) (Entered: 07/08/2014)

Main Doc

58

Jul 11, 2014

SCHEDULING ORDER: dated 7/11/14 re 57 Letter regarding proposed briefing schedule on the individual defendants motoin for summary judgment and spoliation sanctions by Pamela Benities, Anthony Famighetti, Raymond Kelly, The City of New York, Raymond Williams (Zuckerman, Mark); GRANTED. ( Ordered by Judge Sandra L. Townes on 7/11/2014 ) (Guzzi, Roseann) (Entered: 07/15/2014)

Main Doc

59

Jul 16, 2014

TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on July 7, 2014, before Judge Gold. Court Transcriber: Fiore Reporting and Transcription Service, Inc, Telephone number (203)929-9992. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/6/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/18/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/14/2014. (Rocco, Christine) (Entered: 07/16/2014)

Main Doc

60

Aug 6, 2014

Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Summay Judgment Motion Papers by Hadiyah Charles. (Karteron, Alexis) (Entered: 08/06/2014)

Main Doc

61

Aug 12, 2014

ORDER dated 8/11/14 granting 60 Motion for Extension of Time to File. ( Ordered by Judge Sandra L. Townes on 8/11/2014 ) (Guzzi, Roseann) (Entered: 08/12/2014)

Main Doc

62

Aug 14, 2014

Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (responses to written Monell discovery at Docket 56) by The City of New York. (Zuckerman, Mark) (Entered: 08/14/2014)

Main Doc

63

Sep 12, 2014

STATUS REPORT re: Monell discovery and request for conference by Hadiyah Charles (Karteron, Alexis) (Entered: 09/12/2014)

Main Doc

64

Sep 15, 2014

MOTION to Adjourn Conference scheduled for October 24, 2014 by Hadiyah Charles. (Karteron, Alexis) (Entered: 09/15/2014)

Main Doc

65

Sep 24, 2014

Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (reply brief-motion for summary judgment and spoliation sanctions) by Pamela Benities, Anthony Famighetti, Raymond Williams. (Zuckerman, Mark) (Entered: 09/24/2014)

Main Doc

66

Sep 26, 2014

Letter to Judge Townes re: service of motion opposition papers by Hadiyah Charles (Karteron, Alexis) (Entered: 09/26/2014)

Main Doc

67

Sep 29, 2014

ORDER granting 65 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply; The application is granted. Ordered by Judge Sandra L. Townes on 9/25/2014. (Fernandez, Erica) (Entered: 09/29/2014)

Main Doc

68

Oct 8, 2014

MOTION for Summary Judgment and spoliation sanctions by Pamela Benities, Anthony Famighetti, Raymond Williams. (Zuckerman, Mark) (Entered: 10/08/2014)

69

Oct 8, 2014

RULE 56.1 STATEMENT filed by Pamela Benities, Anthony Famighetti, Raymond Williams. (Zuckerman, Mark) (Entered: 10/08/2014)

Main Doc

70

Oct 8, 2014

AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re 68 MOTION for Summary Judgment and spoliation sanctions filed by Pamela Benities, Anthony Famighetti, Raymond Williams. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-N) (Zuckerman, Mark) (Entered: 10/08/2014)

Main Doc

Att 1

Exhibit A-N

71

Oct 8, 2014

AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re 68 MOTION for Summary Judgment and spoliation sanctions (Anthony Famighetti) filed by Pamela Benities, Anthony Famighetti, Raymond Williams. (Zuckerman, Mark) (Entered: 10/08/2014)

Main Doc

72

Oct 8, 2014

MEMORANDUM in Support of motion for summary judgment and spoliation sanctions filed by Pamela Benities, Anthony Famighetti, Raymond Williams. (Zuckerman, Mark) (Entered: 10/08/2014)

73

Oct 8, 2014

AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re 68 MOTION for Summary Judgment and spoliation sanctions (supplemental) filed by Pamela Benities, Anthony Famighetti, Raymond Williams. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit O-P) (Zuckerman, Mark) (Entered: 10/08/2014)

Main Doc

Att 1

Exhibit O-P

74

Oct 8, 2014

MEMORANDUM in Support (supplemental) filed by Pamela Benities, Anthony Famighetti, Raymond Williams. (Zuckerman, Mark) (Entered: 10/08/2014)

Main Doc

75

Oct 8, 2014

RULE 56.1 STATEMENT (supplemental) filed by Pamela Benities, Anthony Famighetti, Raymond Williams. (Zuckerman, Mark) (Entered: 10/08/2014)

Main Doc

76

Oct 8, 2014

RULE 56.1 STATEMENT (plaintiff's opposition 56.1 statement) filed by Pamela Benities, Anthony Famighetti, Raymond Williams. (Zuckerman, Mark) (Entered: 10/08/2014)

77

Oct 8, 2014

AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Opposition re 68 MOTION for Summary Judgment and spoliation sanctions (Alexis Karteron) filed by Pamela Benities, Anthony Famighetti, Raymond Williams. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-20) (Zuckerman, Mark) (Entered: 10/08/2014)

Att 1

Exhibit 1-20

78

Oct 8, 2014

AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Opposition re 68 MOTION for Summary Judgment and spoliation sanctions (Hadiyah Charles) filed by Pamela Benities, Anthony Famighetti, Raymond Williams. (Zuckerman, Mark) (Entered: 10/08/2014)

Main Doc

79

Oct 8, 2014

MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Pamela Benities, Anthony Famighetti, Raymond Williams. (Zuckerman, Mark) (Entered: 10/08/2014)

80

Oct 8, 2014

REPLY to Response to Motion re 68 MOTION for Summary Judgment and spoliation sanctions filed by Pamela Benities, Anthony Famighetti, Raymond Williams. (Zuckerman, Mark) (Entered: 10/08/2014)

Main Doc

81

Oct 23, 2014

Letter regarding issues to be discussed at October 28 status conference by Hadiyah Charles (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3) (Wells, Jordan) (Entered: 10/23/2014)

Att 1

Exhibit 1

Att 2

Exhibit 2

82

Oct 24, 2014

Letter in response to letter of plaintiff of October 23, 2014 at Docket 81 by Pamela Benities, Anthony Famighetti, Raymond Kelly, The City of New York, Raymond Williams (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Zuckerman, Mark) (Entered: 10/24/2014)

Main Doc

Att 1

Exhibit A

83

Oct 30, 2014

Minute Entry for Status Conference held on 10/28/2014 before Chief Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold: Karteron for plaintiff, Zuckerman for defendants. Various discovery rulings on the record. Defendants will answer interrogatories and indicate whether IAB or CCRB categorizes complaints by type (including the type at issue here) and, if so, report on the number of analogous complaints, broken out by time period, by November 14. Defendants will search for relevant Finest messages and produce same by December1. By December 1, defendants will have produced all training and policy material they will rely on in substantive motion practice or at trial. NEXT CONFERENCE: DECEMBER 23, 2014 AT 10:00 AM. Counsel shall submit letters identifying the issues to be raised at the next conference by December 19. (Tape #FTR 11:33-12:01.) (Vasquez, Lea) (Entered: 10/30/2014)

Main Doc

84

Nov 6, 2014

TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on October 28, 2014, before Judge Gold. Court Transcriber: ARIA SERVICES, INC, Telephone number 845-260-1377. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.File redaction request using event "Redaction Request - Transcript" located under "Other Filings - Other Documents". Redaction Request due 11/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/4/2015. (Rocco, Christine) (Entered: 11/06/2014)

Main Doc

85

Nov 13, 2014

Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (Docket 83) by The City of New York. (Zuckerman, Mark) (Entered: 11/13/2014)

Main Doc

86

Dec 1, 2014

Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (Monell) by The City of New York. (Zuckerman, Mark) (Entered: 12/01/2014)

Main Doc

87

Dec 19, 2014

Letter regarding issues to be addressed at Dec. 23 status conference by Hadiyah Charles (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3) (Karteron, Alexis) (Entered: 12/19/2014)

Att 1

Exhibit 1

Att 2

Exhibit 2

Att 3

Exhibit 3

88

Dec 22, 2014

Letter in response to letter of plaintiff of December 19, 2014 by The City of New York (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-F) (Zuckerman, Mark) (Entered: 12/22/2014)

Main Doc

Att 1

Exhibit A-F

89

Dec 28, 2014

Minute Entry for Status Conference held on 12/23/2014 before Chief Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold: With the limited exceptions stated on the record, plaintiff's letter application for additional discovery, Docket Entry 87, is denied. Counsel will contact the Court to schedule further proceedings once the pending dispositive motions are decided or if they believe a settlement conference might be productive. (Tape #FTR 10:04-10:30.) (Vasquez, Lea) (Entered: 12/28/2014)

Main Doc

90

Jan 7, 2015

TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on December 23, 2014, before Judge Gold. Court Transcriber: ARIA SERVICES, INC, Telephone number 845-260-1377. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.File redaction request using event "Redaction Request - Transcript" located under "Other Filings - Other Documents". Redaction Request due 1/28/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/9/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/7/2015. (Rocco, Christine) (Entered: 01/07/2015)

Main Doc

91

Feb 18, 2015

Letter annexing decision in Goodman v. City of New York, et. al., 12 Civ. 5261 (S.D.N.Y.) by Pamela Benities, Anthony Famighetti, Raymond Williams (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Zuckerman, Mark) (Entered: 02/18/2015)

Main Doc

Att 1

Exhibit A

92

Feb 18, 2015

Letter by Pamela Benities, Anthony Famighetti, Raymond Williams (Zuckerman, Mark) (Entered: 02/18/2015)

Main Doc

93

Feb 20, 2015

Letter to Judge Townes re: Goodman v. City of New York by Hadiyah Charles (Karteron, Alexis) (Entered: 02/20/2015)

Main Doc

94

Feb 25, 2015

Letter to Judge Townes discussing Second Circuit decision in Garcia v. Doe, et. al., 12 Civ. 2634 of February 23, 2015 by Pamela Benities, Anthony Famighetti, Raymond Williams (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) (Zuckerman, Mark) (Entered: 02/25/2015)

Main Doc

Att 1

Exhibit

95

Feb 27, 2015

Letter in response to Defendants' letter (Doc. 94) regarding Garcia v. Doe by Hadiyah Charles (Karteron, Alexis) (Entered: 02/27/2015)

Main Doc

96

Mar 26, 2015

MOTION for pre motion conference by Raymond Kelly, The City of New York. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B) (Zuckerman, Mark) (Entered: 03/26/2015)

Att 1

Exhibit A

Att 2

Exhibit B

97

Mar 26, 2015

RULE 56.1 STATEMENT filed by Raymond Kelly, The City of New York. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Q-S) (Zuckerman, Mark) (Entered: 03/26/2015)

Main Doc

Att 1

Exhibit Q-S

98

Mar 27, 2015

Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 96 MOTION for pre motion conference by Hadiyah Charles. (Karteron, Alexis) (Entered: 03/27/2015)

Main Doc

99

Mar 31, 2015

ENDORSED ORDER granting 98 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 96 MOTION for pre motion conference . Response due by 4/9/2015. Ordered by Judge Sandra L. Townes on 3/30/2015. (Barrett, C) (Entered: 03/31/2015)

Main Doc

100

Apr 9, 2015

RESPONSE in Opposition re 96 MOTION for pre motion conference filed by Hadiyah Charles. (Attachments: # 1 Rule 56.1 Statement, # 2 Exhibit 17-19, # 3 Exhibit 20-32) (Karteron, Alexis) (Entered: 04/09/2015)

Att 1

Rule 56.1 Statement

Att 2

Exhibit 17-19

Att 3

Exhibit 20-32

101

Apr 28, 2015

Letter to Judge Townes re recent Lawson and Pluma decisions by Pamela Benities, Anthony Famighetti, Raymond Williams (Zuckerman, Mark) (Entered: 04/28/2015)

Main Doc

102

Apr 29, 2015

Letter to Judge Townes in response to Defendants' letter on Lawson and Pluma decisions by Hadiyah Charles (Karteron, Alexis) (Entered: 04/29/2015)

Main Doc

103

May 18, 2015

Letter to Judge Townes re: recent decision in Higginbotham v. City of New York by Hadiyah Charles (Karteron, Alexis) (Entered: 05/18/2015)

Main Doc

104

May 19, 2015

Letter in response to letter of plaintiff's counsel of May 18, 2015 at Docket 103 by Pamela Benities, Anthony Famighetti, Raymond Williams (Zuckerman, Mark) (Entered: 05/19/2015)

Main Doc

105

Jul 30, 2015

STATUS REPORT (joint) by Raymond Kelly, The City of New York (Zuckerman, Mark) (Entered: 07/30/2015)

106

Nov 5, 2015

STATUS REPORT (joint) by Raymond Kelly, The City of New York (Zuckerman, Mark) (Entered: 11/05/2015)

107

Dec 8, 2015

MOTION for pre motion conference (renewal) by Raymond Kelly, The City of New York. (Zuckerman, Mark) (Entered: 12/08/2015)

Main Doc

108

Dec 15, 2015

RESPONSE in Opposition re 107 MOTION for pre motion conference (renewal) filed by Hadiyah Charles. (Wells, Jordan) (Entered: 12/15/2015)

Main Doc

109

Feb 29, 2016

Letter re Judge Schofield's recent decision in Gonzalez by Pamela Benities, Anthony Famighetti, Raymond Williams (Zuckerman, Mark) (Entered: 02/29/2016)

110

Mar 7, 2016

Letter re: recent decision in Gonzalez v. City of New York and revisions to FRCP 37 by Hadiyah Charles (Karteron, Alexis) (Entered: 03/07/2016)

Main Doc

111

Mar 10, 2016

Letter in response to letter of plaintiff at Docket 110 re changes to FRCP 37 by Pamela Benities, Anthony Famighetti, Raymond Williams (Zuckerman, Mark) (Entered: 03/10/2016)

Main Doc

112

Jun 3, 2016

MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Hadiyah Charles. (Karteron, Alexis) (Entered: 06/03/2016)

113

Aug 9, 2016

NOTICE of Appearance by Mariana Kovel on behalf of Hadiyah Charles (aty to be noticed) (Kovel, Mariana) (Entered: 08/09/2016)

Main Doc

114

Aug 16, 2016

Letter re recent Basinski decision of Judge Swain by Pamela Benities, Anthony Famighetti, Raymond Williams (Zuckerman, Mark) (Entered: 08/16/2016)

Main Doc

115

Dec 2, 2016

Minute Entry: Telephone Conference held on 12/2/2016 before Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold. Kovel and Wells for plaintiff, Zuckerman for defendants. Plaintiff will serve refreshed discovery demands by December 14. The parties will then confer in an effort to agree upon the scope of discovery to be taken and a schedule for completing it. THE PARTIES SHALL SUBMIT A LETTER BY JANUARY 17, 2017 REPORTING ON ANY ISSUES IN DISPUTE AND PROPOSING A CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULE. (Tape #11:33-11:45.) (Gillespie, Saudia) (Entered: 12/02/2016)

Main Doc

116

Dec 6, 2016

TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on December 2, 2016, before Judge Gold. Court Reporter/Transcriber Fiore Reporting and Transcription Service, Inc., Telephone number (203) 929-9992. Email address: cmfiore@sbcglobal.net. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.File redaction request using event "Redaction Request - Transcript" located under "Other Filings - Other Documents". Redaction Request due 12/27/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/6/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/6/2017. (Hong, Loan) (Entered: 12/06/2016)

Main Doc

117

Dec 19, 2016

NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 11/9/2016, before Judge Sandra L. Townes. Court Reporter/Transcriber Richard Barry, Telephone number 718-613-2505. Email address: rwbarrycourtreporter@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.File redaction request using event "Redaction Request - Transcript" located under "Other Filings - Other Documents". Redaction Request due 1/9/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/19/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/20/2017. (Barry, Richard) (Entered: 12/19/2016)

Main Doc

118

Jan 17, 2017

Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Discovery Status Update by Hadiyah Charles. (Kovel, Mariana) (Entered: 01/17/2017)

Main Doc

119

Jan 26, 2017

Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Discovery Status Update by Hadiyah Charles. (Kovel, Mariana) (Entered: 01/26/2017)

Main Doc

120

Feb 1, 2017

Joint MOTION for Discovery conference AND update on status of Monell Discovery by Hadiyah Charles. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 -- Document Requests, # 2 Exhibit A -- Conference Transcript, # 3 Exhibit B -- Conference Transcript) (Kovel, Mariana) (Entered: 02/01/2017)

Main Doc

Att 1

Exhibit 1 -- Document Requests

Att 2

Exhibit A -- Conference Transcript

Att 3

Exhibit B -- Conference Transcript

121

Feb 3, 2017

Letter MOTION to Adjourn Conference currently set for 2/22/17 by Hadiyah Charles. (Kovel, Mariana) (Entered: 02/03/2017)

Main Doc

122

Feb 8, 2017

MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. For the reasons stated herein, Defendants' 68 motion for summary judgment is denied. Defendants' 68 motion for spoliation sanctions is denied without prejudice to renewal if the evidence adduced at trial establishes that the videotape of the incident was likely to favor Defendants. Ordered by Judge Sandra L. Townes on 2/7/2017. (Barrett, C) (Entered: 02/08/2017)

123

Mar 7, 2017

NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Hodgson on behalf of Hadiyah Charles (aty to be noticed) (Hodgson, Robert) (Entered: 03/07/2017)

Main Doc

124

Mar 7, 2017

Minute Entry: Status Conference held on 3/7/2017 before Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold. Kovel and Hodgson for plaintiff, Zuckerman for defendants. Rulings on plaintiff's demands for Monell discovery, Docket Entry 120, entered on the record. Defendants shall produce the discovery ordered today by May 8, 2017. Defendants shall submit their renewed premotion conference application in anticipation of moving for summary judgment on plaintiff's Monell claims by May 22, 2017. (Tape #2:31-3:20.) (Gillespie, Saudia) (Entered: 03/08/2017)

Main Doc

125

Mar 15, 2017

TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on March 7, 2017, before Judge Gold. Court Transcriber: Fiore Reporting and Transcription Service, Inc, Telephone number (203)929-9992. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.File redaction request using event "Redaction Request - Transcript" located under "Other Filings - Other Documents". Redaction Request due 4/5/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/17/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/13/2017. (Rocco, Christine) (Entered: 03/15/2017)

Main Doc

126

May 4, 2017

Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery at Docket 124 by The City of New York. (Zuckerman, Mark) (Entered: 05/04/2017)

Main Doc

127

Jun 7, 2017

Letter to Judge Townes with stipulation of settlement and order of dismissal by Pamela Benities, Anthony Famighetti, Raymond Kelly, The City of New York, Raymond Williams (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Zuckerman, Mark) (Entered: 06/07/2017)

Main Doc

Att 1

Proposed Order

128

Jun 9, 2017

STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE, STIPULATED AND AGREED, The above-referenced action is hereby dismissed against defendants, with prejudice, and without costs, expenses, or attorneys' fees except as specified in paragraph "2" below. Ordered by Judge Sandra L. Townes on 6/6/2017. (Layne, Monique) (Entered: 06/09/2017)

Newsletter

Sign up to receive the Free Law Project newsletter with tips and announcements.