Somaxon Pharmaceuticals Inc. v. Par Pharmaceutical Inc. (1:11-cv-00476)

District Court, D. Delaware

Date Filed
Description

1

May 26, 2011

COMPLAINT filed against Par Pharmaceutical Companies Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 0311-894613.) - filed by Somaxon Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(lid) (Entered: 05/27/2011)

Main Doc

Complaint

Att 1

Exhibit A

Att 2

Civil Cover Sheet

2

May 26, 2011

Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction (lid) (Entered: 05/27/2011)

Main Doc

Magistrate Consent Forms

3

May 26, 2011

Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: 12/23/2010. Date of Expiration of Patent: 8/24/2027.Thirty Month Stay Deadline: 6/23/2013. (lid) (Entered: 05/27/2011)

Main Doc

ANDA Form

4

May 26, 2011

Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Somaxon Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (lid) (Entered: 05/27/2011)

Main Doc

Disclosure Statement

5

May 26, 2011

Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 7,915,307. (lid) (Entered: 05/27/2011)

Main Doc

Patent/Trademark Report to Commissioner

6

Jun 3, 2011

STIPULATION AND ORDER (regarding consolidation) by Par Pharmaceutical Companies Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Inc., Somaxon Pharmaceuticals Inc., Procom One Inc.. (Noreika, Maryellen) (Entered: 06/03/2011)

7

Feb 21, 2013

Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 7,915,307. (Attachments: # 1 Order)(nms) (Entered: 02/21/2013)

Main Doc

Newsletter

Sign up to receive the Free Law Project newsletter with tips and announcements.